EP4354646 - BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Byung-Hyuk Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Jong-Chan Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ki-Youn Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/16] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22916605.3 | 21.12.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022KR21005 | Priority number, date | KR20210188346 | 27.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210188346 | [2024/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023128463 | Date: | 06.07.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4354646 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/572, H01M50/204 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H01M50/258 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/204 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/251 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/267 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/289 (US);
H01M50/572 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK | [2024/16] | English: | BATTERY PACK | [2024/16] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2024 | Translation filed | 08.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2014107241 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [A]KR20150024724 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20180107569 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [XY]KR20210004187 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]EP3809486 (DONGGUAN AMPEREX TECH LTD [CN]) | by applicant | KR20210188346 |