EP4318668 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/06] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No.2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Zehui Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
NI, Huan Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Hongyu Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB, et al Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/06] | Kraus & Lederer Patentanwälte PartGmbB, et al Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22929201.6 | 24.06.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022CN101030 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023245597 | Date: | 28.12.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318668 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.12.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M10/052, H01M10/0525, H01M4/02, H01M4/36, H01M4/505 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/364 (EP,KR);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | H01M4/525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL, SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, BATTERIEMODUL, BATTERIEPACK UND STROMVERBRAUCHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRIC DEVICE | [2024/06] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, MODULE DE BATTERIE, BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2023 | Translation filed | 04.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US10727530 (MATSUSHITA TADASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2020335783 (LEE DONG HUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2021126242 (DU RUI [CN], et al) |