EP4350812 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, BATTERY AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.03.2024 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunwoda Electric Vehicle Battery Co., Ltd. Floor 1-2, Building A, Sunwoda Industrial Park No. 18 Tangjia South Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518107 / CN | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Yi Guangdong 518107 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Wei Guangdong 518107 / CN | 03 /
OUYANG, Yunpeng Guangdong 518107 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Dong Guangdong 518107 / CN | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22946052.2 | 27.12.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022CN142337 | Priority number, date | CN20221110331 | 23.08.2022 Original published format: CN202211010331 | [2024/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2024040829 | Date: | 29.02.2024 | Language: | ZH | [2024/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4350812 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M4/505 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN);
H01M4/525 (EP,CN);
C01G53/42 (CN);
C01G53/44 (CN);
C01G53/50 (EP);
C01G53/66 (CN);
C01G53/68 (CN);
C01G53/70 (CN);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/1391 (EP);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP,CN);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/54 (EP);
C01P2004/01 (CN);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/50 (CN);
C01P2004/51 (EP,CN);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/80 (EP);
C01P2006/11 (EP,CN);
C01P2006/12 (EP,CN);
C01P2006/16 (EP);
C01P2006/17 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (EP,CN);
H01M2004/028 (EP,CN);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL, BATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/15] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, BATTERY AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2024/15] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, BATTERIE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | Translation filed | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |