EP4358208 - BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRIC DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/17] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No.2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jingxuan Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Qian Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
YE, Yonghuang Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
LI, Quanguo Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
XU, Xiaofu Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
WU, Zeli Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 07 /
XIAO, Dejun Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 08 /
YU, Chunpeng Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22946286.6 | 17.06.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022CN99470 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023240599 | Date: | 21.12.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4358208 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/056 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/653 (EP);
H01M50/209 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK UND ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2024/17] | English: | BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRIC DEVICE THEREOF | [2024/17] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE ASSOCIÉ | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2024 | Translation filed | 19.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010170874 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]US2012263999 (GUNJI AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]CN107004920 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [X]CN109196710 (BLUE SOLUTIONS CANADA INC) | by applicant | GB102472008T |