EP4290039 - FLAP DAMPER, ASSISTANCE DEVICE AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mantion SAS Z.I. de Trépillot 7 Rue Gay Lussac 25006 Besançon CEDEX / FR | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVAUX, Martial 25006 Besançon CEDEX / FR | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Munier, Laurent Cabinet Laurent Munier Avocat 18 rue de Stockholm 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23020160.0 | 28.03.2023 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | FR20220005571 | 09.06.2022 Original published format: FR 2205571 | [2023/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4290039 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06, E05F5/00 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
E05F5/003 (EP);
E05D15/063 (EP);
E05Y2201/212 (EP);
E05Y2201/636 (EP);
E05Y2201/64 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFER FÜR ÖFFNUNGSELEMENTE, HILFSVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2023/50] | English: | FLAP DAMPER, ASSISTANCE DEVICE AND USE | [2023/50] | French: | AMORTISSEUR D'OUVRANTS, DISPOSITIF D'AIDE ET UTILISATION | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 15.03.2024 | Request for decision received: Priority | 10.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 10.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Result of request for decision (Priority): Request procedure closed | 11.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.09.2024 | Request for further processing filed |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007121731 (ZIMMER GUENTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, line 4 - line 8 * * figure 5 *; | [XAI]US2013160240 (KENNY PHILIP RICHARD [NZ]) [X] 14,15 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0119] * * figures 1-9 * [A] 12,13 [I] 1-11; | [A]EP3095941 (TAMAR S R O [CZ]) [A] 7 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2017198510 (SHIN JUNG-CHUL [KR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] ** figures 1-8 * | by applicant | WO2004021833 | US2010260586 | US2013160240 |