EP4205817 - PULL STATION RELEASE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kidde-Fenwal, LLC 400 Main Street Ashland, MA 01721 / US | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/27] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KJELLMAN, Thomas Carl Ashland, 01721 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 23150159.4 | 03.01.2023 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | US202263296340P | 04.01.2022 Original published format: US 202263296340 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205817 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/00, A62C37/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A62C3/006 (EP,US);
A62C37/00 (EP);
A62C99/009 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSEMECHANISMUS FÜR ZUGSTATION | [2023/27] | English: | PULL STATION RELEASE MECHANISM | [2023/27] | French: | MÉCANISME DE LIBÉRATION DE POSTE DE TRACTION | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3515218 (GARDNER NEWELL J, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 71 - column 4, line 8 ** figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5297636 (NORTH GRADY [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 9, lines 42-68 * * figures 7, 8 *; | [A]US6286604 (OU REN-SHENG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 11-15 *; | [E]EP4169585 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [E] 1-3,5-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0046] * * figures 1-6 * |