EP4273223 - METHOD FOR EXTRACTING AND PRESERVING MICROORGANISMS FROM A STOOL SAMPLE OF A LIVING BEING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Labor LS SE & Co. KG Mangelsfeld 4, 5, 6 97708 Bad Bocklet-Großenbrach / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balles, Jürgen 97723 Oberthulba / DE | 02 /
Rüffer, Andreas 97708 Bad Bocklet / DE | 03 /
Büttner, Christian 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | 04 /
Westhäuser, Florian 96476 Bad Rodach-Rossfeld / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23150459.8 | 05.01.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | DE202210111013 | 04.05.2022 Original published format: DE102022111013 | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273223 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKTION UND KONSERVIERUNG VON MIKROORGANISMEN AUS EINER STUHLPROBE EINES LEBEWESENS | [2023/45] | English: | METHOD FOR EXTRACTING AND PRESERVING MICROORGANISMS FROM A STOOL SAMPLE OF A LIVING BEING | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION ET DE CONSERVATION DE MICRO-ORGANISMES À PARTIR D'UN ÉCHANTILLON FÉCAL D'UN ÊTRE VIVANT | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 07.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018369147 (AFFAGARD HERVÉ [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * examples 1-3 * * claims 10, 11 * [I] 5,9-13; | [XI] - HEVIA ARANCHA ET AL, "Application of density gradient for the isolation of the fecal microbial stool component and the potential use thereof", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep16807, (20151119), URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/srep16807.pdf, XP093084206 [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 8 * [I] 4,5,9-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep16807 | [A] - BILINSKI JAROSLAW ET AL, "Multimodal Approach to Assessment of Fecal Microbiota Donors based on Three Complementary Methods", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MEDICINE, (20200629), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:10.3390/jcm9072036, page 2036, XP093084504 [A] 9-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/jcm9072036 |