EP4209978 - ADAPTABLE PRESENTATION FORMAT FOR VIRTUAL REALITY CONSTRUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitel Networks Corporation 4000 Innovation Drive Kanata Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3K1 / CA | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yalawarmath, Anilkumar 560040 Bengaluru / IN | 02 /
Naidoo, Logendra Ottawa, K1S 0W8 / CA | 03 /
Rajendran, Boopalan 560035 Bangalore / IN | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | McDougall, James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 23150707.0 | 09.01.2023 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | US202217571148 | 07.01.2022 Original published format: US202217571148 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209978 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06T19/006 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] |
Former [2023/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSBARES PRÄSENTATIONSFORMAT FÜR KONSTRUKTE DER VIRTUELLEN REALITÄT | [2023/28] | English: | ADAPTABLE PRESENTATION FORMAT FOR VIRTUAL REALITY CONSTRUCTS | [2023/28] | French: | FORMAT DE PRÉSENTATION ADAPTABLE POUR CONSTRUCTIONS DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 12.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2024 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018136814 (PAREKKADAN BIJU [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * [I] 2-7,9-15; | [I] - HENSEN BENEDIKT ET AL, ImPres: An Immersive 3D Presentation Framework for Mixed Reality Enhanced Learning, 20211103, PAGE(S) 28 - 39, (20211103), XP047615544 [I] 1-15 * Sections 1, 3, 4 and 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-030-90785-3_3 |