EP4184780 - CONTROL DEVICE AND POWER CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UDA, Ryosuke Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
KIKUCHI, Takeshi Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
FUJIWARA, Shuhei Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
KONO, Yoshiyuki Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 23151203.9 | 25.04.2019 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184780 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02J3/36, H02M7/49, H02J3/38, H02M1/00, H02M7/483 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
H02M7/4837 (EP);
H02J3/388 (EP,US);
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
H02M1/0077 (EP);
H02M7/49 (EP);
H02M1/0025 (US);
Y02E60/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LEISTUNGSUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/21] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE AND POWER CONVERSION DEVICE | [2023/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19926264.3 / EP3961904 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH03174610 (SHIKOKU SOGO KENKYUSHO KK, et al); | [YA]JP6433636B ; | by applicant | JP2018129963 |