EP4227655 - PULP SUSPENSION TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/33] | MEASURING SYSTEM OF A SUSPENSION TREATMENT DEVICE | ||
[2024/01] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Technologies Oy Keilasatama 5 02150 Espoo / FI | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KETTUNEN, Heikki 04400 Järvenpää / FI | 02 /
CARLSTRÖM, Robert 651 15 Karlstad / SE | 03 /
EDSTRÖM, Tomas 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | 04 /
HUMANN, Christian 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
HÖGLUND, Tomas 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | 06 /
LUNDBERG, Jörgen 10074 Stockholm / SE | 07 /
MARROCCO, Carlo Ville Saint-Laurent, Quebec, H4R 2B2 / CA | 08 /
SUNDLING, Emma 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | 09 /
RUOTSI, Juha 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 23152212.9 | 18.01.2023 | [2023/33] | Priority number, date | FI20220005115 | 10.02.2022 Original published format: FI 20225115 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4227655 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4227655 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/024, G01K1/14, G01K13/02, B30B9/20, D21C9/02, D21D1/40, D21G9/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G01K1/14 (EP);
G01K1/143 (CN,FI);
G01K13/026 (CN);
B30B9/20 (EP);
D21C9/02 (EP,FI);
D21C9/18 (FI);
D21D1/40 (EP,FI);
D21G9/0018 (EP);
G01J5/0037 (CN);
G01K1/024 (EP);
G01K1/026 (FI);
G01K13/02 (EP,FI);
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | G01K1/14, G01K13/02, G01K1/024, D21C9/00, D21F1/78, D21F3/02, D21G1/02, D21G9/00, B30B9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HOLZSTOFFSUSPENSIONSBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/01] | English: | PULP SUSPENSION TREATMENT DEVICE | [2024/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SUSPENSION DE PÂTE À PAPIER | [2024/01] |
Former [2023/33] | MESSSYSTEM EINER SUSPENSIONSBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2023/33] | MEASURING SYSTEM OF A SUSPENSION TREATMENT DEVICE | ||
Former [2023/33] | SYSTÈME DE MESURE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SUSPENSION | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 26.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011303380 (ANDERSSON RICKARD [SE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN204343097U (VOITH PATENT GMBH) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2019368946 (PITKÄNEN TATU [FI], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038]; figure 2a *; | [XA]US10739210 (MCCULLOCH MALCOLM DUNCAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 10, line 62 - column 12, line 25; figure 1 * * column 12, line 48 - column 13, line 26; figures 3a,3b * * column 20, line 5 - column 22, line 4; figure 14 * [A] 6-8; | [T] - Anonymous, "Online view for pulp flow distribution in TwinRoll Press - Valmet TwinRoll Press Vat Temperature Monitoring", Valmet corporate website, Espoo, Finland, (20220706), URL: https://valmet.my.salesforce-sites.com/solutionfinderweb/FilePreview?id=0694K00000CGYrnQAH, (20230623), XP093057406 [T] 1-8 | by applicant | WO2021206601 |