EP4219138 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND CARRIER MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITANO, Yuko Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23152384.6 | 19.01.2023 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | JP20220012806 | 31.01.2022 Original published format: JP 2022012806 | JP20220012880 | 31.01.2022 Original published format: JP 2022012880 | JP20220195377 | 07.12.2022 Original published format: JP 2022195377 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219138 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B30B15/26, B30B15/28 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B30B15/26 (EP);
G01M7/025 (US);
B30B15/28 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND TRÄGERMEDIUM | [2023/31] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND CARRIER MEDIUM | [2023/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT DE SUPPORT | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4088899 (MILLER ROBERT C, et al) [A] 1-15* abstract; figure - *; | [A]US4813320 (MALLOY JOSEPH P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract; figure - *; | [XA]US2008178676 (LIASI EVANGELOS [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 17] , [0 32] , [0 40] - [0042]; figures 3, 5, 6 * [A] 2-13,15; | [XI]US2021293613 (KITANO YUKO [JP]) [X] 1-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 53] , [0 55] , [0 57] , [0 63] , [0 65] , [0 94]; figures 1-4 * [I] 12,13 | by applicant | JPH0798280B | JP2021146368 |