EP4219913 - VARIABLE PRESSURE TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malta Inc. One Broadway, 14th Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Malta Inc. 210 Broadway, Suite 201 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APTE, Raj Cambridge, 02139 / US | 02 /
DEVAUL, Richard Cambridge, 02139 / US | 03 /
LAROCHELLE, Philippe Cambridge, 02139 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23153026.2 | 11.12.2017 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | US201615395622 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: US201615395622 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4219913 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4219913 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01K13/02, F02C1/10, F02G1/04, F02C6/14 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
F02C1/105 (EP,US);
F02C1/05 (US);
F02C6/14 (EP,US);
F02C9/24 (US);
H02K7/1823 (US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBINE MIT VARIABLEM DRUCK | [2023/31] | English: | VARIABLE PRESSURE TURBINE | [2023/31] | French: | TURBINE À PRESSION VARIABLE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/29] | 11.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17886005.2 / EP3563041 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2012047892 (HELD TIMOTHY JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1b * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0048] * [A] 3; | [E]WO2018125511 (X DEV LLC [US]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0229] ** figure 33 * |