EP4231306 - HIGH EFFICACY FUNCTIONAL INGREDIENT BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stokely-Van Camp, Inc. 433 W. Van Buren Street Suite 350N Chicago, IL 60607 / US | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Jenna Shelton, 06484 / US | 02 /
Yuan, Tsz-Ching (James) Yorktown Heights, 10598 / US | 03 /
Zhao, Lei Nanuet, 10954 / US | 04 /
Nyman, Lara North Haven, 06473 / US | 05 /
Barnes, Kelly Algonquin, 60102 / US | 06 /
Dioum, Elhadji Chicago, 60637 / US | 07 /
Chu, YiFang Glenview, 60026 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | McNamara, Kathryn Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich, Norfolk NR4 7UG / GB | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 23153156.7 | 24.01.2023 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | US202217673028 | 16.02.2022 Original published format: US202217673028 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231306 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/10, A61K31/00, G16B15/30, G16C20/70, G16H20/60, G16B5/00, // G16C20/30 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
G16H20/60 (EP);
G16C20/30 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP);
G16B5/00 (EP);
G16C20/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHWIRKSAME FUNKTIONELLE WIRKSTOFFMISCHUNGEN | [2023/34] | English: | HIGH EFFICACY FUNCTIONAL INGREDIENT BLENDS | [2023/34] | French: | MÉLANGES D'INGRÉDIENTS FONCTIONNELS À HAUTE EFFICACITÉ | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 23.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004067986 (SASSOVER NATHAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A]US2005240355 (BROWN NATHAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013144887 (CHEN JAKE YUE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]US2014114987 (HOENG JULIA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] ** paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0094] *; | [XYI]US2017169183 (KOYAMA TAKAHIKO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,14 * the whole document * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * [Y] 1-15 [I] 4,6,11,13; | [Y]US2019355458 (ZHANG PING [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0069] *; | [Y]US2020227176 (EIFERT CHERYL L [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0030] * * page 0058 *; | [Y]US2021287763 (SHARMA OM [IN]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0132] * |