EP4218416 - MANUAL MEAT PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walter, Stephan Hochfellnstr. 2a 83253 Rimsting / DE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Flach Bauer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23154300.0 | 31.01.2023 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | DE202220100553U | 01.02.2022 Original published format: DE 202022100553 U | [2023/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218416 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A22C7/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A22C7/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANUELLE FLEISCHPRESSE | [2023/31] | English: | MANUAL MEAT PRESS | [2023/31] | French: | PRESSE MANUELLE POUR LA VIANDE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 31.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE8610688U ; | [XAY]US2006078642 (PALESE JEFFREY W [US]) |