EP4201852 - COMMISSIONING STATION FOR THE AUTOMATIC COMMISSIONING OF GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TGW Logistics Group GmbH Ludwig Szinicz Straße 3 4614 Marchtrenk / AT | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOPPLER, Christoph 4902 Wolfsegg a. H. / AT | 02 /
HOLZNER, Stefan 83569 Zaisering / DE | 03 /
FEISTL, Sebastian Maximilian 83229 Aschau i. Chiemgau / DE | 04 /
PRECHTL, Christian 4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | 05 /
SCHRÖPF, Harald 4600 Wels / AT | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 23154647.4 | 07.03.2019 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | AT20180050207 | 09.03.2018 Original published format: AT 502072018 | AT20180050217 | 13.03.2018 Original published format: AT 502172018 | AT20180050886 | 10.10.2018 Original published format: AT 508862018 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201852 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/52, B65G1/137, B65G47/91 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
B65G1/1378 (EP,AT,US);
B65G47/914 (EP,AT,US);
B25J15/0616 (AT);
B25J9/1697 (AT);
B65G47/52 (EP,AT);
B65G47/66 (US);
B65G2203/041 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMMISSIONIERSTATION ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN KOMMISSIONIEREN VON WAREN | [2023/26] | English: | COMMISSIONING STATION FOR THE AUTOMATIC COMMISSIONING OF GOODS | [2023/26] | French: | POSTE DE PRÉPARATION DE COMMANDES ET PROCÉDÉ AUTOMATIQUE DE COMMANDES DE MARCHANDISES | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 19.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19718228.0 / EP3762319 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4407324 (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH [DE]); | [YA]US2014244026 (NEISER RAYMOND R [US]) | by applicant | JPS5259475 | DE4407324 | US5564893 | EP2315714 | WO2013090970 | EP2984007 | WO2016138101 | WO2016163666 | US9751693 | WO2018006112 |