EP4223956 - VEGETATED INTEGRATED FORMWORK WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDSB Ingenierie 7, Avenue de l'Europe 67720 Hoerdt / FR | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELMSTETTER, Didier 67170 Olwisheim / FR | 02 /
DUBOIS, Frédéric 69720 Saint Laurent de Mure / FR | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/32] | 01 /
HELMSTETTER, Didier 67170 OLWISHEIM / FR | ||
02 /
DUBOIS, Frédéric 69720 SAINT LAURENT DE MURE / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4a rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 23155189.6 | 06.02.2023 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | FR20220001043 | 07.02.2022 Original published format: FR 2201043 | [2023/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223956 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4223956 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/86, A01G9/02 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
E04B1/86 (EP);
A01G9/025 (EP);
E04B2/8617 (EP);
E04B2001/8419 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAUER MIT INTEGRIERTER BEGRÜNUNGSSCHALUNG | [2023/32] | English: | VEGETATED INTEGRATED FORMWORK WALL | [2023/32] | French: | MUR À COFFRAGE INTÉGRÉ VÉGÉTALISÉ | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 16.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1690993 (H & H COMPOSANTS [FR]); | [Y]EP2618648 (CANEVAFLOR [FR]); | [YA]WO2016142283 (MARINELLI SERGIO [IT]); | [YA]CN109629707 (UNIV SUZHOU SCI & TECHNOLOGY) | Examination | EP2618648 |