EP4318163 - AUTONOMOUS AGRICULTURAL WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS E-Systems GmbH Sommerkämpen 11 49201 Dissen / DE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mähler, Reinhold 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 02 /
Ehlert, Christian 33719 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
Bormann, Bastian 33334 Gütersloh / DE | 04 /
Baumgarten, Joachim 48361 Beelen / DE | 05 /
Neitemeier, Dennis 59510 Lippetal / DE | 06 /
Witte, Johann 58730 Fröndenberg / DE | 07 /
Redenius, Jannik 32361 Pr. Oldendorf / DE | 08 /
Bohl, Arne 33330 Gütersloh / DE | 09 /
Nacke, Dr., Eberhard 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 10 /
Apke, Christoph 33659 Bielefeld / DE | 11 /
Korthals, Timo 33818 Leopoldshöhe / DE | 12 /
Thiesmann, Waldemar 49080 Osnabrück / DE | 13 /
Schröder, Axel 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 14 /
Monkenbusch, Robin 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23155860.2 | 09.02.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | DE202210110132 | 27.04.2022 Original published format: DE102022110132 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318163 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A01B69/008 (EP);
G05D1/0027 (US);
G05D1/0022 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/6987 (EP);
G05D2105/15 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/37] |
Former [2024/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOME LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2024/06] | English: | AUTONOMOUS AGRICULTURAL WORKING MACHINE | [2024/06] | French: | MACHINE AGRICOLE AUTONOME | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/37] | 07.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017192431 (FOSTER CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2020159220 (HURD COLIN JOSH [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0026] , [0029] , [0033] , [0045] - [0047] - [0049] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 12-15,17 [I] 8,11,16 | by applicant | WO2015173073 |