EP4243559 - METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A CONNECTION, RADIO ACCESS NETWORK ELEMENT DEVICE AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Bingzhao Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 02 /
QUAN, Wei Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Xuelong Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23157165.4 | 22.05.2018 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | CN201710562453 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710562453 | [2023/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4243559 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4243559 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/19, H04W76/15, H04L5/00, H04W24/10, H04W76/27 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04W76/15 (EP,CN);
H04W76/19 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0098 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W36/0033 (US);
H04W36/0069 (US);
H04W36/08 (US);
H04W76/18 (US);
H04W76/27 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | H04W76/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINER VERBINDUNG, ELEMENT VORRICHTUNG EINES FUNKZUGANGSNETZWERKS UND COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/37] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A CONNECTION, RADIO ACCESS NETWORK ELEMENT DEVICE AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE CONNEXION, DISPOSITIF À ÉLÉMENT DE RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS RADIO ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18832811.6 / EP3637942 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2018232124 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [E] 1-4,7-14* paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0154] *; | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "RRC_INACTIVE with MR_DC", vol. RAN WG3, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-172430_RRC_INACTIVE WITH MR_DC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20170626), XP051302372 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] * * figures 3,4 * |