EP4220006 - LIGHTING DEVICE WITH LIGHT-EMITTING FILAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BOMMEL, Ties 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HIKMET, Rifat, Ata, Mustafa 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PET, Robert, Jacob 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23157705.7 | 08.06.2020 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | EP20190180908 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19180908 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4220006 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/04, F21V19/00, F21V23/00, // F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10, F21V7/05 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
F21S8/04 (EP);
F21V23/006 (EP,US);
F21V19/0035 (US);
F21V19/005 (EP);
F21V23/06 (US);
F21V7/05 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT LICHTEMITTIERENDEN FILAMENTEN | [2023/31] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE WITH LIGHT-EMITTING FILAMENTS | [2023/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE À FILAMENTS ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTS | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 02.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20730066.6 / EP3987221 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104110632 (LIN SHIQIAN); | [I]CN104406068 (NINGBO YUSING ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [XI]CN105627125 (GUIZHOU GUANGPUSEN PHOTOELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]CN205824949U (WANG DINGFENG); | [XI]EP3208514 (BGT MAT LTD [GB]); | [A]US2018066811 (KNAPP THOMAS ALEXANDER [US], et al) | by applicant | CN104075169 |