EP4203481 - INTELLIGENT AUTOMATED ASSISTANT FOR TV USER INTERACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN OS, Marcel Cupertino, California, 95014 / US | 02 /
SADDLER, Harry J. Cupertino, California, 95014 / US | 03 /
NAPOLITANO, Lia T. Cupertino, California, 95014 / US | 04 /
RUSSELL, Jonathan H. Cupertino, California, 95014 / US | 05 /
LISTER, Patrick M. Cupertino, California, 95014 / US | 06 /
DASARI, Rohit Cupertino, California, 95014 / US | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 23157829.5 | 27.03.2015 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | US201462019312P | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462019312 P | US201414498503 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: US201414498503 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203481 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/41, G10L15/26, H04N21/422, H04N21/431, G06F3/16, G06F16/73, G09C1/00, G10L15/22, // H04N21/472 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G09C1/00 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4394 (US);
G06F16/73 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/738 (EP,US);
G06F16/7867 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G10L15/22 (EP,CN,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,CN,US);
G10L17/00 (US);
G10L17/22 (US);
H04N21/2541 (US);
H04N21/25891 (US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/42203 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/42222 (US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4316 (US);
H04N21/4438 (US);
H04N21/4532 (US);
H04N21/4627 (US);
H04N21/4722 (US);
H04N21/482 (US);
H04N21/4826 (US);
H04N21/4828 (US);
H04N21/4882 (US);
H04N21/84 (US);
H04N21/858 (US);
G10L2015/223 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTER AUTOMATISIERTER ASSISTENT FÜR TV-BENUTZERINTERAKTIONEN | [2023/26] | English: | INTELLIGENT AUTOMATED ASSISTANT FOR TV USER INTERACTIONS | [2023/26] | French: | ASSISTANT AUTOMATISÉ INTELLIGENT POUR INTERACTIONS D'UTILISATEUR DE TÉLÉVISION | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15717712.2 / EP3127339 | EP19160560.9 / EP3528502 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003078784 (JORDAN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0190] *; | [XY]US2006075429 (ISTVAN ANTHONY F [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0203] - paragraph [0211] * * paragraph [0218] - paragraph [0223] * * paragraph [0256] - paragraph [0259] * * paragraph [0262] - paragraph [0267] * * paragraph [0373] * * paragraph [0395] - paragraph [0396] * * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0373] * * paragraph [0391] * [Y] 11,13; | [Y]WO2011069035 (TIVO INC [US], et al) [Y] 11,13 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [00134] - paragraph [00136] ** paragraph [00141] * | by applicant | US20110987982 |