EP4210380 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING PDCP DEVICE AND SDAP DEVICE IN NEXT-GENERATION MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Seungri Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Donggun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Soenghun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
SAYENKO, Alexander Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 23157844.4 | 05.06.2018 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | KR20170069584 | 05.06.2017 Original published format: KR 20170069584 | KR20170101940 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170101940 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210380 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/02 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H04W28/0268 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W28/0263 (EP);
H04W28/10 (EP,KR);
H04W76/11 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION EINER PDCP-VORRICHTUNG UND SDAP-VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION | [2023/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING PDCP DEVICE AND SDAP DEVICE IN NEXT-GENERATION MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION DE DISPOSITIF PDCP ET DE DISPOSITIF SDAP DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE DE PROCHAINE GÉNÉRATION | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 17.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18814013.1 / EP3614722 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Reflective Mapping in AS", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704988 REFLECTIVE MAPPING IN AS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051275495 [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 2 - 2.1 * * page 2, paragraph 2.2 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - ERICSSON, "Reflective QoS and Flow-ID", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704379 - REFLECTIVE QOS AND FLOW-ID, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051274952 [Y] 1-15 * sections 2.1, 2.2, 2.3, 2.4 and 3; page 1 - page 4 * | [A] - CATT, "QoS re-mapping of QoS flow and DRB", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704266, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051274844 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 1 - 2 * * figure 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 2.1 - 2.3 * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "SDAP configuration", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170504), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704474 SDAP CONFIGURATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_98/Docs/, (20170504), XP051263587 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 1 - 2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Configurability for UL QoS flow ID marking", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704469 CONFIGURABILITY FOR UL QOS FLOW ID MARKING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRAN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051275035 [A] 1-15 * sections 1, 2; page 1 - page 3; figures 1, 2 * |