EP4215280 - SOLIDS SEPARATION, WASHING AND SAMPLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DWC AS Hegglandsdalen 5200 Oslo / NO | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AREFORD, Anders 5217 Hagavik / NO | 02 /
BRUNTVEIT, Joergen 5073 Bergen / NO | 03 /
LYNGBOE, Karl Ole Daviksnes 5216 Lepsoey / NO | 04 /
MCCANN, Dominic Patrick Hampshire SO51 9LN / GB | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 23158311.3 | 13.11.2015 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | GB20140020257 | 14.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201420257 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4215280 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4215280 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B04C5/04, B04C5/13, B04C5/14 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
B04C5/04 (EP,EA);
B04C3/04 (GB);
E21B43/35 (EP,EA,GB,US);
B01D43/00 (GB);
B01D45/12 (EP,GB);
B04C3/06 (GB);
B04C5/02 (GB);
B04C5/081 (EP);
B04C5/103 (EP);
B04C5/13 (EA);
B04C5/14 (EA);
B04C5/24 (EP,GB);
B04C7/00 (GB);
B04C9/00 (EP,GB);
E21B43/2607 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFTRENNUNGS-, WASCH- UND PROBENAHMESYSTEM | [2023/30] | English: | SOLIDS SEPARATION, WASHING AND SAMPLING SYSTEM | [2023/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉPARATION, DE LAVAGE ET D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE SOLIDES | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15794581.7 / EP3218115 | EP21202936.7 / EP3967406 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5879541 (PARKINSON DAVID JOHN [GB]); | [X]GB2403440 (DYNAMIC PROC SOLUTIONS PLC [GB]) |