EP4209144 - LEISTEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LEISTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHUHOBERTEILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASICS Corporation 1-1, Minatojima-Nakamachi 7-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8555 / JP | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSHO, Ayu Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 650-8555 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Satoru Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 650-8555 / JP | 03 /
TANIGUCHI, Norihiko Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 650-8555 / JP | 04 /
KOZUKA, Yuya Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 650-8555 / JP | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 23158732.0 | 26.06.2020 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | JP20190191353 | 18.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019191353 | JP20200084988 | 14.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020084988 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209144 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/02, A43B23/02, A43D3/02, A43D3/04, A43D3/14, B33Y80/00, A43D1/02 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A43B1/02 (EP);
A43D3/02 (EP,US);
A43B23/0205 (US);
A43B23/0215 (EP);
A43B23/0245 (US);
A43D1/025 (EP);
B29C64/106 (US);
B29C64/20 (US);
B29C64/386 (US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
A43D2200/60 (EP);
B29L2031/505 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | LAST, METHOD FOR PRODUCING LAST, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SHOE UPPER | [2023/28] | English: | LEISTEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LEISTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHUHOBERTEILS | [2023/28] | French: | FORME, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FORME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TIGE DE CHAUSSURE | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20182732.6 / EP3808202 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US118663 (WIGHT, HENRY) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2658004 (ELDRIDGE JOHN C, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 ** claim 1 * | by applicant | US1550232 | US2016206049 | US2018014609 | CN109732913 |