EP4243296 - HYBRID BEAMFORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QURESHI, Muhammad Ayyaz Neu-Ulm / DE | 02 /
STEIERT, Martin Blaustein / DE | 03 /
FELGENTREFF, Tilman Holzkirchen / DE | 04 /
KALYANASUNDARAM, Suresh Bangalore / IN | 05 /
P NAIR, Jinesh Bangalore / IN | 06 /
GULATI, Shalini Bangalore / IN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23159566.1 | 02.03.2023 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | FI20220005200 | 07.03.2022 Original published format: FI 20225200 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4243296 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04W16/28, H04W72/044, H04W72/566 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,CN);
H04W72/046 (US);
H01Q1/246 (EP);
H01Q21/061 (EP);
H01Q3/38 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDE STRAHLFORMUNG | [2023/37] | English: | HYBRID BEAMFORMING | [2023/37] | French: | FORMATION DE FAISCEAU HYBRIDE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 13.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3496293 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2021203396 (NI HAO [CN], et al) |