EP4242285 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 250 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEETHAM, Tyler Ewing, 08618 / US | 02 /
LIN, Chun Ewing, 08618 / US | 03 /
DYATKIN, Alexey Borisovich Ewing, 08618 / US | 04 /
TSAI, Jui-Yi Ewing, 08618 / US | 05 /
BOUDREAULT, Pierre-Luc T. Ewing, 08618 / US | 06 /
HAMZE, Rasha Ewing, 08618 / US | 07 /
FELDMAN, Jerald Ewing, 08618 / US | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Dragotti & Associati S.R.L., et al Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | Viganò, Elena, et al Dragotti & Associati S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 23160232.7 | 06.03.2023 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | US202263318269P | 09.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263318269 P | US202263326548P | 01.04.2022 Original published format: US 202263326548 P | US202263329688P | 11.04.2022 Original published format: US 202263329688 P | US202263329924P | 12.04.2022 Original published format: US 202263329924 P | US202263342198P | 16.05.2022 Original published format: US 202263342198 P | US202263367818P | 07.07.2022 Original published format: US 202263367818 P | US202263395173P | 04.08.2022 Original published format: US 202263395173 P | US202263400416P | 24.08.2022 Original published format: US 202263400416 P | US202263401800P | 29.08.2022 Original published format: US 202263401800 P | US202318177178 | 02.03.2023 Original published format: US202318177178 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4242285 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, H10K85/30, C07F15/00 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
C07F15/0086 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/40 (EP,US);
C07F15/0033 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/346 (EP,KR);
C07B2200/05 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1033 (US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,KR,US);
H10K2101/10 (EP);
H10K2101/90 (EP);
H10K85/654 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE MATERIALIEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/37] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES | [2023/37] | French: | MATÉRIAUX ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTS ORGANIQUES ET DISPOSITIFS | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 12.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2020354393 (BAE HYEJIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * claims 1-20 * [I] 5; | [X]US2021305520 (THOMPSON NICHOLAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-20 * * page 181 *; | [XI]EP3909965 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,6-15 * claims 1-15 *[I] 4,5 | by applicant | US4769292 | US5061569 | US5247190 | JPH0773529 | EP0650955 | US5639914 | US5703436 | US5707745 | KR0117693Y | US5834893 | US5844363 | US6013982 | US6087196 | US6091195 | US6097147 | WO0139234 | US2001019782 | US6294398 | US6303238 | US6337102 | WO0215645 | US2002034656 | US6413656 | EP1239526 | EP1244155 | US6468819 | US2002158242 | US6517957 | US2003068526 | US2003072964 | WO03040257 | US2003138657 | WO03060956 | US2003162053 | US2003175553 | US6653654 | US6656612 | US2003230980 | US6670645 | JP2004022334 | US6687266 | US2004036077 | US6699599 | WO2004093207 | US6835469 | WO2005014551 | WO2005019373 | JP2005112765 | US2005123751 | US2005123788 | US2005123791 | JP2005149918 | US2005139810 | US6916554 | US6921915 | WO2005075451 | WO2005089025 | JP2005268199 | US2005238919 | US2005244673 | CN1696137 | US2005260449 | US2006008670 | US2006065890 | EP1642951 | EP1647554 | WO2006056418 | US2006127696 | US2006134459 | US2006134462 | WO2006072002 | WO2006081780 | WO2006081973 | US2006182993 | WO2006095951 | US2006202194 | US2006240279 | WO2006114966 | US2006251923 | WO2006121811 | EP1725079 | US2006280965 | US7154114 | US2007018155 | US2007034863 | WO2007018067 | JP2007091719 | US2007087321 | US2007103060 | US2007104979 | US2007104980 | US2007104977 | US2007111026 | WO2007063754 | US2007138437 | US2007145888 | US2007160905 | US2007181874 | US2007190359 | US2007224450 | WO2007108362 | JP2007254297 | US2007231600 | WO2007111263 | US7279704 | EP1841834 | WO2007115970 | WO2007115981 | US2007252140 | WO2007125714 | US2007278938 | US2007278936 | US2008005851 | US2008014464 | US2008020237 | JP2008021687 | US7332232 | WO2008023550 | WO2008023759 | WO2008035571 | US2008091025 | US2008106190 | US2008107919 | WO2008054584 | WO2008056746 | US7378162 | US2008124572 | US2008145707 | US2008161567 | WO2008078800 | WO2008096609 | WO2008101842 | US2008210930 | US2008220265 | US2008233434 | US2008233410 | US7431968 | US2008261076 | US2008297033 | US2008303417 | WO2009000673 | WO2009003455 | WO2009003898 | WO2009008277 | US2009017330 | WO2009011327 | US2009030202 | EP2020694 | WO2009021126 | US2009039776 | EP2034538 | US2009066235 | US2009085476 | US2009104472 | WO2009050281 | US2009101870 | US2009108737 | EP1841834 | US2009115320 | US2009115322 | US2009115316 | US7534505 | WO2009063833 | EP2062907 | WO2009066778 | WO2009066779 | US2009140637 | US2009167167 | US2009167161 | US2009167162 | WO2009086028 | US2009179555 | US2009179554 | EP2085382 | WO2009100991 | US2009218940 | WO2009145016 | US2009302743 | WO2009148269 | US2009309488 | US2010012931 | US7675228 | WO2010028151 | US2010084966 | US2010090591 | US2010102716 | US2010105902 | US2010108990 | WO2010056066 | WO2010054731 | US7728137 | WO2010061824 | JP4478555B | US2010148663 | WO2010067894 | US7740957 | WO2010072300 | KR20100079458 | US7759489 | US2010187984 | WO2010086089 | WO2010107244 | US2010244004 | WO2010118029 | US2010270916 | US2010288362 | US2010295032 | US2011007385 | US2011037057 | US2011057559 | WO2011044988 | WO2011051404 | US2011108822 | US7951947 | WO2011075644 | WO2011074770 | US7968146 | US2011156017 | US2011163302 | WO2011081423 | WO2011081431 | WO2011086863 | KR20110088898 | US2011204333 | WO2011105373 | US2011215710 | WO2011107491 | US2011227049 | US2011240968 | TW201139402 | US2011278551 | US2011285275 | US8067099 | WO2012020327 | US2012075273 | KR20120032054 | JP2012074444 | US2012126221 | US2012146012 | US2012193612 | KR20120088644 | US2012205642 | US2012214993 | WO2012128298 | CN102702075 | WO2012133644 | WO2012133649 | US2012292601 | KR20120129733 | WO2012163471 | WO2012177006 | US2013009543 | WO2013018530 | US2013033172 | WO2013024872 | WO2013035275 | WO2013039073 | US8415031 | KR20130043460 | US2013105787 | WO2013081315 | JP2013110263 | WO2013079217 | US2013146848 | WO2013087142 | US2013165653 | WO2013094620 | KR20130077473 | US2013175519 | TW201329200 | US2013181190 | WO2013107487 | WO2013118812 | TW201332980 | WO2013120577 | US2013241401 | KR20130108183 | WO2013145667 | US8557400 | KR20130115564 | WO2013157367 | EP2660300 | US8592586 | WO2013175747 | WO2013174471 | WO2013180376 | US2013334521 | WO2013191404 | US2014001446 | WO2014002873 | WO2014007565 | EP2684932 | WO2014009310 | WO2014008982 | US2014014925 | US2014014927 | JP2014009196 | WO2014015935 | WO2014015937 | US2014034914 | WO2014023377 | WO2014024131 | WO2014030872 | WO2014030921 | WO2014031977 | WO2014034791 | WO2014038456 | CN103694277 | US2014103305 | US2014117329 | EP2730583 | US2014183517 | WO2014104514 | US2014183503 | WO2014104499 | WO2014104535 | EP2757608 | WO2014112450 | US2014225088 | US2014246656 | WO2014142472 | US2014284580 | WO2014157018 | US8871361 | US2015060804 | US2015123047 | US2016163995 | US9466803 | US2017263869 | US10672997 | US2020373510 | - MING YAN et al., Tetrahedron, (20150000), vol. 71, pages 1425 - 30 | - ATZRODT et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., vol. 46, no. 20070000, pages 7744 - 65 | - BALDO et al., "Highly Efficient Phosphorescent Emission from Organic Electroluminescent Devices", Nature, (19980000), vol. 395, doi:10.1038/25954, pages 151 - 154, XP001002103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/25954 | - BALDO et al., "Very high-efficiency green organic light-emitting devices based on electrophosphorescence", Appl. Phys. Lett., (19990000), vol. 75, no. 3, doi:10.1063/1.124258, pages 4 - 6, XP012023409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124258 | - FINK, RHEISCHKEL, YTHELAKKAT, MSCHMIDT, H.-W, Chem. Mater, (19980000), vol. 10, pages 3620 - 3625 | - POMMERELME, JVESTWEBER, HGUSS, WMAHRT, R. FBASSLER, HPORSCH, M. DAUB, J. Adv. Mater, (19950000), vol. 7, page 551 | EP20010617493 | EP20010624500 | EP20010698613 | EP20010806334 | EP20020055700 | EP20020055701 | EP20010239526 | EP20010602648 | EP20010734038 | US20110210320 | EP20010930964 | EP20010961743 | EP20010956007 | EP20010968131 | EP20010972613 | EP20010997799 | EP20020011790 | WO2007US23098 | WO2009US42829 | KR20090133652 | DE20121005215 |