EP4215536 - HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHN, Heechoon Yongin-si / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyeongmin Yongin-si / KR | 03 /
UM, Hyunah Yongin-si / KR | 04 /
LEE, Yeseul Yongin-si / KR | 05 /
IM, Yirang Yongin-si / KR | 06 /
KO, Soobyung Yongin-si / KR | 07 /
KIM, Youngkook Yongin-si / KR | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 23161893.5 | 20.11.2019 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | KR20180147692 | 26.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180147692 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215536 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08, H10K85/40, H10K85/60, // H10K50/11, H10K85/30 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
C07F7/0814 (EP,CN);
H10K85/40 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/12 (CN,KR);
C07F7/0812 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (US);
H10K85/60 (CN);
H10K85/631 (EP);
H10K85/636 (US);
H10K85/654 (EP,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,US);
H10K85/6576 (EP);
C09K2211/1018 (US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K2101/30 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/13 (US);
H10K50/15 (US);
H10K50/16 (US);
H10K50/165 (US);
H10K50/17 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG UND ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2023/30] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2023/30] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19210317.4 / EP3657563 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014003440 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [KR]) [X] 1,2,6-13 * claims 1, 7, 8; compounds C-8 * [I] 3-5; | [X]US2015041770 (LEE JUNG-SUB [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,12,13 * page 52, paragraph 296 - page 53, paragraph 300; examples 1, 2 ** page 47; compound 4 *; | [XI]WO2016080749 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [KR]) [X] 1,2,6-13 * claims 1, 5, 6, 9; compounds H2-192 * [I] 3-5 | by applicant | EP20190210317 |