EP4246123 - SPECIMEN ANALYZER, SPECIMEN ANALYSIS METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1 Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Konobu Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kenichiro Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | 03 /
NAKANISHI, Noriyuki Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0073 / JP | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23162048.5 | 15.03.2023 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | JP20220042964 | 17.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022042964 | JP20220042965 | 17.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022042965 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4246123 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, // G01N15/00 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G01N15/1429 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (US);
G01N15/1456 (US);
G01N15/1459 (EP);
G01N35/00732 (US);
G01N35/0092 (US);
G16B40/10 (US);
B01L2200/16 (US);
B01L2300/0654 (US);
B01L2400/082 (US);
G01N15/01 (US);
G01N15/149 (EP);
G01N2015/012 (EP);
G01N2015/016 (EP);
G01N2015/018 (EP);
G01N2015/1402 (EP);
G01N2015/1486 (EP);
G01N2015/1488 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] |
Former [2023/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENANALYSEGERÄT, PROBENANALYSEVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2023/38] | English: | SPECIMEN ANALYZER, SPECIMEN ANALYSIS METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2023/38] | French: | ANALYSEUR D'ÉCHANTILLON, PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'ÉCHANTILLON ET PROGRAMME | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2902769 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]); | [XI]US2022003745 (KIMURA KONOBU [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2018203568 |