EP4215967 - LENS MOVING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sang Ok 07796 Seoul / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seong Min 07796 Seoul / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jun Taek 07796 Seoul / KR | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 23162075.8 | 23.07.2015 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | KR20140093861 | 24.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140093861 | KR20140093934 | 24.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140093934 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215967 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/08, G02B27/64 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G02B27/646 (EP,US);
G02B7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2023/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LINSENBEWEGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/30] | English: | LENS MOVING APPARATUS | [2023/30] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉPLACEMENT DE LENTILLE | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15178085.5 / EP2977807 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2006243320 (ARIMA DEVICE KK) [I] 1-3,5-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0014]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4; | [A]JP2006293244 (ARIMA DEVICE KK) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2008158412 (TAGOME MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]KR20100048362 (HYSONIC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,4-9 *; | [Y]US2011096178 (RYU JAE-WOOK [KR], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 1-5, 33-37 *; | [Y]US2012092768 (SHIRAKI MANABU [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2012120512 (WADE TATSUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * figure 9 * [Y] 4 [I] 2,3,5-14; | [A]JP2012177753 (SHICOH ENG CO LTD) [A] 1* paragraph [0048]; figures 1,8 * |