EP4272971 - PRINTING SYSTEM CAPABLE OF PRINTING IN ANY OF MULTIPLE POWER MODES AND CONTROL METHOD FOR PRINTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Masaki Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23162259.8 | 16.03.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | JP20220048226 | 24.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022048226 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272971 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/38, H04N1/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
B41J29/38 (EP,US);
G06F3/1229 (EP,US);
B41J2/32 (US);
G06F1/263 (EP);
G06F1/3212 (EP);
G06F3/1203 (US);
G06F3/121 (EP);
G06F3/1284 (EP);
H04N1/00899 (EP);
H04N1/00901 (EP);
H04N1/32657 (EP);
G03G15/5004 (US);
G06F3/0625 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKSYSTEM ZUM DRUCKEN IN EINEM VON MEHREREN LEISTUNGSMODI UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE DRUCKVORRICHTUNG | [2023/45] | English: | PRINTING SYSTEM CAPABLE OF PRINTING IN ANY OF MULTIPLE POWER MODES AND CONTROL METHOD FOR PRINTING APPARATUS | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION CAPABLE D'IMPRIMER DANS L'UN QUELCONQUE DE MULTIPLES MODES DE PUISSANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002033872 (TAKAHASHI YASUO [JP]) [A] 12* paragraph [0078] *; | [A]JP2015001699 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-14,19 * paragraphs [0043] - [0044] *; | [ID]JP2019111759 (CANON DENSHI KK) [ID] 1-14,19 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0018] , [ 0044]; figures 1-6; claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2019111759 |