EP4295660 - CONTROLLING MOVEMENT OF A ROBOTIC GARDEN TOOL FOR DOCKING PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Cordless GP 100 Innovation Way Anderson, SC 29621 / US | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Shing Hin Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
CHOI, Man Ho Hong Kong / CN | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB P.O. Box 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23162357.0 | 16.03.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | US202263320637P | 16.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263320637 P | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4295660 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
A01D34/008 (EP,CN,US);
G05D1/0225 (EP,US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
G05D1/028 (EP);
A01D2101/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER BEWEGUNG EINES ROBOTISCHEN GARTENWERKZEUGS FÜR ANDOCKZWECKE | [2023/52] | English: | CONTROLLING MOVEMENT OF A ROBOTIC GARDEN TOOL FOR DOCKING PURPOSES | [2023/52] | French: | COMMANDE DU MOUVEMENT D'UN OUTIL DE JARDIN ROBOTISÉ À DES FINS D'AMARRAGE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/31] | 24.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US8433468 (JOHNSON DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * See the passages cited in the ESOP * [A] 3,4,6,7,10,11,13,14 [I] 2,5,8,12; | [A]US2014379196 (DA ROCHA FRANCISCO O [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015077045 (HARRIS TROY W [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]AU2019200410 (TTI MACAO COMMERCIAL OFFSHORE LTD [CN]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2019216012 (HAHN KLAUS [HK], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US11172608 (HAHN KLAUS [HK], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2018001358 | WO2017CN91129 |