EP4273300 - POROUS AMORPHOUS METAL OXIDE-BASED CATALYSTS FOR OXYGEN EVOLUTION REACTION AND WATER SPLITTING SYSTEM USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 26, Jong-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03188 / KR | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Hyun Su 34124 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hee Soo 34124 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
SEOK, Tae Hong 34124 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
LEE, Seung Ok 34124 Daejeon / KR | 05 /
IM, Ju Hwan 34124 Daejeon / KR | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Frick, Robert Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23163217.5 | 21.03.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | KR20220055257 | 04.05.2022 Original published format: KR 20220055257 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4273300 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4273300 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04, B01J23/75, C25B9/19, C25B11/077, B01J23/825, B01J23/843, B01J37/02, B01J37/08, B01J37/10, B01J23/76, B01J23/835 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
C25B11/077 (EP,KR);
B01J23/75 (KR);
C25B11/091 (US);
B01J23/14 (KR);
B01J23/76 (EP);
B01J35/23 (EP);
B01J35/391 (EP);
B01J35/393 (EP);
B01J35/613 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0201 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP,KR);
B01J37/10 (EP);
C25B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C25B11/031 (US);
C25B11/052 (US);
C25B9/17 (US);
C25B9/19 (EP);
B01J23/825 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | C25B1/04, B01J23/75, C25B9/19, C25B11/077 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSE KATALYSATOREN AUF BASIS VON AMORPHEM METALLOXID FÜR SAUERSTOFFENTWICKLUNGSREAKTION UND WASSERSPALTUNGSSYSTEM DAMIT | [2023/45] | English: | POROUS AMORPHOUS METAL OXIDE-BASED CATALYSTS FOR OXYGEN EVOLUTION REACTION AND WATER SPLITTING SYSTEM USING THE SAME | [2023/45] | French: | CATALYSEURS À BASE D'OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE AMORPHE POREUX POUR RÉACTION DE DÉGAGEMENT D'OXYGÈNE ET SYSTÈME DE FRACTIONNEMENT DE L'EAU LES UTILISANT | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2013071069 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [A]CN106423184 (UNIV NORTH CHINA ELECTRIC POWER); | [I]CN112340781 (UNIV JINAN); |