EP4250498 - CONTACT ELEMENT, CONTACT ELEMENT SYSTEM AND PLUG CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaichi Electronics Deutschland GmbH Concor Park Bahnhofstrasse 20 85609 Aschheim-Dornach / DE | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHEL, Dirk 85778 Haimhausen / DE | 02 /
WIMMER GAIR, Ulrich 85658 Egmating / DE | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23163322.3 | 22.03.2023 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | DE202210202848 | 23.03.2022 Original published format: DE102022202848 | [2023/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4250498 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6474, H01R24/44, H01R24/86 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
H01R13/6474 (EP);
H01R24/44 (EP);
H01R24/86 (EP);
H01R13/04 (EP);
H01R4/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTELEMENT, KONTAKTELEMENTSYSTEM UND STECKVERBINDER | [2023/39] | English: | CONTACT ELEMENT, CONTACT ELEMENT SYSTEM AND PLUG CONNECTOR | [2023/39] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONTACT, SYSTÈME D'ÉLÉMENT DE CONTACT ET CONNECTEUR ENFICHABLE | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8777640 (BUCK CARSTEN [DE], et al); | [X]EP3823109 (TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP3872937 (ROSENBERGER HOCHFREQUENZTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |