EP4223130 - CANNABINOID CHEWING GUM WITH HIGH INTENSITY SWEETENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 16.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NordicCan A/S Dandyvej 19 7100 Vejle / DK | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruun, Heidi Ziegler 7120 Vejle Ø / DK | 02 /
Eriksen, Ane 7120 Vejle Ø / DK | 03 /
Boesen, Dorte Schackinger 7100 Vejle / DK | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Kanved, Nicolai Kanved Patent Consulting ApS Advice House Lysholt Allé 10 7100 Vejle / DK | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 23163771.1 | 10.10.2019 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | US201916257939 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: US201916257939 | CA20193031500 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: CA 3031500 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223130 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23G4/06, A61K9/00, A23G4/12, A23L33/105, A61K31/05, A61K9/68 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/05 (EP);
A23G4/06 (EP);
A23G4/068 (EP);
A23G4/12 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A61K9/0058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CANNABINOID-KAUGUMMI MIT HOCHINTENSIVEN SÜSSSTOFFEN | [2023/32] | English: | CANNABINOID CHEWING GUM WITH HIGH INTENSITY SWEETENERS | [2023/32] | French: | GOMME À MÂCHER À BASE DE CANNABINOÏDES AVEC ÉDULCORANTS À HAUTE INTENSITÉ | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19805127.8 / EP3876742 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2009120080 (MAREDA HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [YD] 1-20* example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2015154780 (FERTIN PHARMA AS [DK]) [Y] 1-20 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2017059859 (MEDCAN PHARMA AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,5-18,20 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2017202424 (MEDCAN PHARMA AS [DK]) [X] 1,11 * page 46, line 17 - page 56, line 6; example -; claim - * * page 26, lines 1-22 *; | [X]US9833408 (GREENSPOON ALLEN [CA]) [X] 1,2,5-18,20 * column 1, line 56 - column 10, line 18; example -; claim - * | by applicant | WO2009120080 | - "Dissolution Test for Chewing Gums, General Monograph 2.9.25", In European Pharmacopoeia | - H.P. FIEDLER, "Lexikon der Hilfstoffe für Pharmacie", Kosmetik und Angrenzende Gebiete, (19810000), pages 63 - 64 | - A. DOUGLAS KINGHORN et al., Phytocannabinoids, vol. 103, pages 1 - 30 |