EP4220541 - LUMINANCE CHARACTERISTICS GENERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROTA, Takeshi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
MIYAJIMA, Susumu Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
YONEDA, Akira Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KASHIWAGI, Yoshiichiro Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
NISHIO, Toshiroh Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
KOZUKA, Masayuki Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23163831.3 | 26.02.2018 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | US201762558092P | 13.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762558092 P | US201762580918P | 02.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762580918 P | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4220541 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, H04N5/20, H04N9/68, H04N9/82, G11B27/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04N9/8205 (EP);
H04N9/73 (EP,US);
G06T5/92 (EP);
G11B27/00 (EP);
H04N21/431 (US);
H04N5/20 (EP,US);
H04N5/66 (US);
H04N5/92 (US);
H04N9/68 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON LUMINANZEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2023/31] | English: | LUMINANCE CHARACTERISTICS GENERATION METHOD | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE LUMINANCE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18857102.0 / EP3684063 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001033260 (NISHITANI SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraphs [0123] - [0124] * * figures 1, 2, 21, 23 *; | [A]US2004190789 (LIU MIN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0053] * * paragraph [0059] * * figures 5, 6 *; | [A]EP1742178 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0029] * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP1857976 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] * * paragraph [0050] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2015002559 (FUJINE TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0164] - paragraph [0169] * * paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0213] ** figures 1,4,5,15,16,19,25 *; | [A]US2015009411 (FUJINE TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0098] - [0100] * * paragraph [0122] * * figures 1, 9 *; | [A]US2015071615 (MESSMER NEIL W [CA]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0116] * * figures 3, 11B * | by applicant | JP2017184249 |