EP4218823 - NOVEL POLYMERIC HGH PRODRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASCENDIS PHARMA ENDOCRINOLOGY DIVISION A/S Tuborg Boulevard 12 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurpiers, Thomas 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Rau, Harald 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Exner, Evelyn 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
Jensen, Steen 2900 Hellerup / DK | 05 /
Rasmussen, Grethe Nørskov 2900 Hellerup / DK | 06 /
Lessmann, Torben 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 07 /
Wegge, Thomas 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 08 /
Hermann, Alina 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 09 /
Schubert, Nina 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 10 /
Splanemann, Anna 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 11 /
Zettler, Joachim 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Büchel, Edwin Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23164305.7 | 17.11.2015 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | EP20140193603 | 18.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14193603 | [2023/31] | Previously filed application, date | EP20150797642 | 17.11.2015 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4218823 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4218823 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/60, A61P43/00, A61K38/27, A01G17/00, A01G2/00, A61P5/06, A61P13/12 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
A61K38/27 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A01G17/005 (EP,CN,IL);
A01G2/00 (EP,IL);
A01G7/06 (CN,IL);
A61K47/12 (IL,KR,US);
A61K47/20 (IL,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (IL);
A61K9/08 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/19 (IL,KR);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P5/06 (EP,IL,KR,RU);
C07K14/61 (IL,RU);
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | A61K47/50, A61P43/00, A61K38/27, A61K47/60, A61P13/12, A61P5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE POLYMERE HGH-PRODRUGS | [2023/31] | English: | NOVEL POLYMERIC HGH PRODRUGS | [2023/31] | French: | NOUVEAUX PROMÉDICAMENTS À BASE D'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE HUMAINE (HGH) POLYMÈRE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 13.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15797642.4 / EP3237014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1579873 (COMPLEX BIOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0040] , [0042]; claim - *; | [Y]WO2005099768 (COMPLEX BIOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1625855 (COMPLEX BIOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0042] , [0044]; claim - *; | [A]WO2006102659 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS AL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XDY]EP2113256 (ASCENDIS PHARMA AS [DK]) [XD] 1,5,10,11,13,14,16 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0083] - [0089]; claim - * [Y] 1-16; | [XDY]WO2009133137 (ASCENDIS PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [XD] 1-5,10,11,13,14,16 * the whole document * * pages 23-28; example -; claim - * [Y] 1-16 |