EP4266365 - SEMICONDUCTOR POWER DEVICE, SEMICONDUCTOR POWER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COOLING A SEMICONDUCTOR POWER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2023/43] | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTOLARIA, Lluis 4600 Olten / CH | 02 /
MALEKI, Milad 5417 Untersiggenthal / CH | 03 /
FISCHER, Fabian 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23164362.8 | 27.03.2023 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | WO2022EP60248 | 19.04.2022 Original published format: PCT/EP2022/060248 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266365 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/473 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01L23/3675 (US);
H01L21/56 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] |
Former [2023/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERLEISTUNGSBAUELEMENT, HALBLEITERLEISTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN EINES HALBLEITERLEISTUNGSBAUELEMENTS | [2023/43] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR POWER DEVICE, SEMICONDUCTOR POWER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COOLING A SEMICONDUCTOR POWER DEVICE | [2023/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE, SYSTÈME SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1781076 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7-10,14* paragraphs [0010] - [0018]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2034521 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7,10,11,14 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016]; figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]US2017336152 (JEONG SANG CHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0057]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 13; | [YA]US2019341327 (TEYSSEYRE JEROME [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * paragraphs [0030] , [0040] , [0048] - [0049] - [0054] , [0077] - [0084] - [0095] , [0096]; figures 1B,9a,9b,13,14 * [A] 1,2,4,5,9-11,13,14 |