EP4219874 - ACTUATOR FOR POWERED VEHICLE CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strattec Power Access LLC 2998 Dutton Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPROULE, Gregory Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 02 /
KUHLMAN, Howard Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 03 /
EBERLE, Frederick Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 04 /
CHAMP, William Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 05 /
BUELL, Steven Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 06 /
FRITSCHLE, Jacob Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 07 /
SAND, Daniel Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 08 /
CROCIATA, Paul Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 09 /
WILCOX, David Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 10 /
SCHYMIK, Brian Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 11 /
ZIENTAK, Michael Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 12 /
NGEM, Kimpon Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23164730.6 | 23.04.2020 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | US201962839268P | 26.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962839268 P | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219874 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/41, E05F15/603, E05F15/611, E05F15/632, E05F15/75 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
E05F15/41 (EP);
E05F15/611 (EP);
E05F15/632 (EP);
E05F15/75 (EP);
F16D28/00 (US);
F16D67/02 (US);
F16D7/00 (US);
F16H1/28 (US);
B60J5/047 (US);
B60J5/06 (US);
B60J5/101 (US);
B60J5/108 (US);
B62D33/0273 (US);
E05Y2201/21 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/216 (EP);
E05Y2201/232 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/246 (EP);
E05Y2201/434 (US);
E05Y2201/462 (EP);
E05Y2201/702 (EP);
E05Y2201/72 (EP);
E05Y2400/3015 (EP);
E05Y2400/44 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/45 (US);
E05Y2400/85 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGVERSCHLUSS | [2023/31] | English: | ACTUATOR FOR POWERED VEHICLE CLOSURE | [2023/31] | French: | ACTIONNEUR POUR FERMETURE DE VÉHICULE MOTORISÉE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 31.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20275078.2 / EP3734007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3005188B ; | [A]US2004113456 (GREUEL INGO [DE], et al); | [XI]GB2551210 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]); | [XI]US2018080271 (OSTER PETER [DE], et al) |