EP4223328 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEGENERATE BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 22.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anika Therapeutics, Inc. 32 Wiggins Avenue Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHN, Edward S. Dover, MA 02030 / US | 02 /
LIN, Chia-En Concord, MA 01742 / US | 03 /
WHITE, Colin D. North Reading, MA 01864 / US | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 23164800.7 | 26.04.2017 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | US201662328313P | 27.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662328313 P | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4223328 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4223328 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/46, A61L27/52, A61L27/56, A61L27/58, A61L24/00 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61L24/0031 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/20 (KR,US);
A61B17/3468 (KR);
A61B17/3472 (KR,US);
A61B17/8816 (KR,US);
A61B17/8825 (KR,US);
A61B17/8833 (KR,US);
A61L24/0036 (EP,KR,US);
A61L24/0042 (EP,KR,US);
A61L24/0084 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/025 (US);
A61L27/12 (KR,US);
A61L27/50 (US);
A61L27/52 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61B2017/00893 (KR,US);
A61B2017/8838 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/0084, C08L5/08 (EP,US);
A61L27/46, C08L5/08 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2023/32] | A61L27/46, A61L27/52, A61L27/56, A61L27/58, A61L24/00, A61P19/02, A61P19/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEGENERIERTEN KNOCHEN | [2023/32] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEGENERATE BONE | [2023/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'OS DÉGÉNÉRÉ | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 04.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17722590.1 / EP3448447 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1237585 (BIOSYNTECH CANADA INC [CA]); | [I]WO2004000374 (ROBERT MATHYS STIFTUNG [CH], et al); | [A]EP1891984 (GRAFTYS [FR]); |