EP4224818 - CLIENT STEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airties SAS 3, Boulevard de Sebastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOKTURK, Sarper PK 34394 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
AKCAN, Alper PK 34394 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
TASKIN, Metin Ismail PK 34394 Istanbul / TR | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Pellegrini, Marie Claude 7, rue Meyerbeer 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/32] | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 23165507.7 | 14.12.2015 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | GB20140022183 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: GB 201422183 | US201514747438 | 23.06.2015 Original published format: US201514747438 | WO2015EP64163 | 23.06.2015 Original published format: PCT/EP2015/064163 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4224818 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4224818 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/125, H04W40/12, H04W40/36, H04W48/20, H04W48/18, H04W84/12, H04L9/40, H04W12/088 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
H04W40/22 (GB,US);
H04L43/12 (US);
H04L45/125 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W40/12 (EP,GB,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W40/36 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | H04L45/125, H04W40/12, H04W40/36, H04W48/20, H04W48/18, H04W84/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | CLIENT-LENKUNG | [2023/32] | English: | CLIENT STEERING | [2023/32] | French: | ORIENTATION DE CLIENT | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 22.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15823142.3 / EP3231141 | EP20201134.2 / EP3780515 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US7342906 (CALHOUN PATRICE R [US]) [X] 1-8,14,15 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 67; figures 1,4 * [A] 9-13; | [XA]US2008126531 (SETIA DEEPINDER [US], et al) [X] 1,9-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] *[A] 2-8 |