EP4253963 - CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instrumentation Laboratory Company 180 Hartwell Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOREV, Benjamin Bedford, 01730 / US | 02 /
SCH0NBRUN, Ethan Bedford, 01730 / US | 03 /
BLANKENSTEIN, Gert Bedford, 01730 / US | 04 /
ANDRUZZI, Luisa Bedford, 01730 / US | 05 /
WINKLER, Anne Bedford, 01730 / US | 06 /
SCOTT, Jacqueline Bedford, 01730 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Richards, Michèle E., et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23165549.9 | 30.03.2023 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | US202263325304P | 30.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263325304 P | US202218086873 | 22.12.2022 Original published format: US202218086873 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4253963 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4253963 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/86, G16H50/30, G16H70/40 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/86 (EP,US);
G01N33/4905 (US);
C12Q1/56 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G01N2800/226 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLINISCHES ENTSCHEIDUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/40] | English: | CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2023/40] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA DÉCISION CLINIQUE | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 18.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9201065 (CARDIOVASCULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [I] 1-3,7,14,15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 9, line 9 - line 13 * * figures 4,5 * * page 23, line 27 - page 24, line 12 * * page 28, line 15 - page 29, line 10 ** claims 8,14,19 *; | [X]US2019101526 (BRUN MARCAURELE [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,14,15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * claims 1-16 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0124] *; | [X] - K Doubleday ET AL, "Clot Signature Curves and the ACL Advance TM", (20011101), URL: https://de.werfen.com/~/media/il%20shared/docs/hemostasis/literature/100%20%20%20clot%20signature%20curves%20and%20the%20acl%20advance.pdf, (20200123), XP055661048 [X] 1-3,7,14,15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 5 - page 10 * * page 13 * |