EP4243235 - PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION SYSTEM AND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER TRANSMISSION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Fei Shenzhen 518129 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Yongbing Shenzhen 518129 / CN | 03 /
FAN, Guoping Shenzhen 518129 / CN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23166313.9 | 23.01.2019 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | CN201810114068 | 05.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810114068 | [2023/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4243235 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4243235 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H02J3/32, H02J3/46, // H02J7/35 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/383 (CN);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,CN,US);
H02M3/158 (US);
H02M7/797 (US);
H02S40/32 (US);
H02J2300/26 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/35 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | H02J3/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | FOTOVOLTAISCHES ENERGIEERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM UND FOTOVOLTAISCHES LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/37] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION SYSTEM AND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER TRANSMISSION METHOD | [2023/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19747298.8 / EP3742572 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010198421 (FAHIMI BABAK [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * paragraphs [0040] - [0051] - paragraphs [0067] - [0068]; figures 1A,1B,4-6; claims 1,6 * [I] 2-5,7; | [A]CN204089686U (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0087] - [0100]; figures 6a,6b *; | [XI]JP2016001935 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,6,8 * paragraphs [0016] - [0038] - paragraphs [0065] - [0072]; figures 1-11; claims 1-5 * [I] 2-5,7; | [A]CN106026646 (UNIV HEBEI TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0007] - [0020] *; | [A]JP2017143633 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0014] , [0021] - [0028]; figure 1 * |