EP4257773 - RISE AND FALL GUTTER BRACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surefix (Midlands) Ltd Hill Top Works Pool Street Swadlincote Derbyshire DE11 8EG / GB | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENDRICK, Alexander James Swadlincote Derbyshire DE11 8EG / GB | 02 /
BREALEY, Richard David Swadlincote Derbyshire DE11 8EG / GB | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23166832.8 | 05.04.2023 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | GB20220005187 | 08.04.2022 Original published format: GB 202205187 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257773 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/072 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
E04D13/0722 (EP,GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] |
Former [2023/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEIG- UND FALLRINNENHALTER | [2023/41] | English: | RISE AND FALL GUTTER BRACKET | [2023/41] | French: | SUPPORT DE GOUTTIÈRE À MONTÉE ET DESCENTE | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 10.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB191505118 (KEMP FREDERICK JOHN); | [XI]GB127529 (COTTERILL SAMUEL); | [A]GB2176824 (HUNTER INT LTD); | [XI]DE29709769U (SCHWALL THEO [DE]); | [XI]DE19821785 (BAUMJOHANN ADOLF [DE], et al); | [A]DE202004000940U (FIEDLER MARTIN [DE]) |