EP4273182 - POLYURETHANE FORMULATION WITH REDUCED ALDEHYDE EMISSION AND COMPOSITE STRUCTURES MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benecke-Kaliko AG Beneckeallee 40 30419 Hannover / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerken, Andreas 30165 Hannover / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23166841.9 | 05.04.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | DE202210204321 | 02.05.2022 Original published format: DE102022204321 | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273182 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, B32B27/40, C08G18/08, C08J9/30, C08L75/04, C08L75/08, D06N3/14 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C08G18/792 (EP);
C08G18/0866 (EP);
C08G18/798 (EP);
C08J7/04 (EP);
C08J9/0028 (EP);
C08J9/30 (EP);
C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L75/08 (EP);
D06N3/0045 (EP);
D06N3/0095 (EP);
D06N3/14 (EP);
D06N3/142 (EP);
D06N3/145 (EP);
C08G2110/00 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C08J2375/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08K5/25 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08K5/43 (EP);
C08L75/08, C08K3/22, C08K5/25 (EP);
C08L75/08, C08K3/22, C08K5/43 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYURETHANFORMULIERUNG MIT VERMINDERTER ALDEHYDEMISSION UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE VERBUNDGEBILDE | [2023/45] | English: | POLYURETHANE FORMULATION WITH REDUCED ALDEHYDE EMISSION AND COMPOSITE STRUCTURES MADE THEREFROM | [2023/45] | French: | FORMULATION DE POLYURÉTHANE À ÉMISSION RÉDUITE D'ALDÉHYDE ET STRUCTURES COMPOSITES FABRIQUÉES À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008187738 (TONOMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0031] - [0035] - [0052] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0094] - [0115] - [0134] - [0137]; example 4; claims 1,3-6,20; tables 1,2 * [A] 1-12,15; | [AD]US2017349716 (ZHU JENNIFER HAIJIN [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] - [0017] - [0043] ** paragraphs [0044] - [0054]; tables 1-3 *; | [XAI]WO2021013607 (EVONIK OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,13 * page 13, line 17; examples E1,E2; tables 1-3 * * page 1, lines 1-34 * * page 3, lines 2-32 * * page 12, lines 8-16 * * page 6, line 2 - page 10, line 16 * [A] 8-12,14,15 [I] 5 | by applicant | EP1059379 | KR100890351B | JP4407190B | EP2379465 | DE102012106557 | US2017349716 | WO2019174754 | WO2020111945 |