EP4218732 - TABLETS COMPRISING ELTROMBOPAG OLAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Pharma AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2023/42] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPSI, Shivakumar, G. King Of Prussia, Pennsylvania, 19406 / US | 02 /
MULLER, Francis, X. King Of Prussia, Pennsylvania, 19406 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | Pfister-Fu, Yixin Novartis Pharma AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 23166852.6 | 01.08.2007 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | US20070915761P | 03.05.2007 Original published format: US 915761 P | US20070947731P | 03.07.2007 Original published format: US 947731 P | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218732 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/54, A61K47/34, A61P7/06, A61K31/4152, A61K9/20 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/4152 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2077 (IL,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/00 (EA,IL);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/14 (EA,IL);
A61K9/19 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/20 (IL,US);
A61K9/2018 (IL,KR);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/2059 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/2095 (IL,US);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P7/02 (EP,IL);
A61P7/04 (EP,IL);
A61P7/06 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2024/08] |
Former [2023/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | HR | 16.01.2024 | Title | German: | TABLETTEN ENTHALTEND ELTROMBOPAG OLAMIN | [2023/31] | English: | TABLETS COMPRISING ELTROMBOPAG OLAMINE | [2023/31] | French: | COMPRIMÉS COMPRENANTS DE L'ELTROMBOPAG OLAMINE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 16.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2024 | Observations by third parties | 11.07.2024 | Observations by third parties | 30.07.2024 | Observations by third parties | 10.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07840632.9 / EP2152237 | EP15199469.6 / EP3090730 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001044474 (CURATOLO WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [ID]US2006178518 (MOORE STEPHEN [GB]); | by applicant | WO0189457 | WO03098002 | US2004019190 | WO2004096154 | US2006178518 | US7160870 | US2007105824 | WO2001US16863 | WO2003US16255 | WO2004US13468 | other | US2006178518 |