EP4280036 - CHARACTER INPUT DEVICE, CHARACTER INPUT METHOD, AND CHARACTER INPUT PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-Ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Takahiro Kyoto, 6170002 / JP | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 23168093.5 | 14.04.2023 | [2023/47] | Priority number, date | JP20220082011 | 19.05.2022 Original published format: JP 2022082011 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280036 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/038, G06F3/0488, G06F3/04886, G06F3/16, G06F3/023 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F3/0233 (CN);
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G06F3/0237 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] |
Former [2023/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEICHENEINGABEVORRICHTUNG, ZEICHENEINGABEVERFAHREN UND ZEICHENEINGABEPROGRAMM | [2023/47] | English: | CHARACTER INPUT DEVICE, CHARACTER INPUT METHOD, AND CHARACTER INPUT PROGRAM | [2023/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ENTRÉE DE CARACTÈRES | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 13.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008300886 (PATCH KIMBERLY [US]); | [A]US2016313868 (WENG FULIANG [US], et al); | [A]JP2019087058 (PERSONAL AI CORP) | by applicant | JP2021532492 |