EP4270892 - ALLOCATING RESOURCE ENTITIES FOR TRACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATHYANARAYANAMURTHY, Kiran 572104 Tumakuru / IN | 02 /
ANDRIANOV, Anatoly Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 23168847.4 | 20.04.2023 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | FI20220005345 | 25.04.2022 Original published format: FI 20225345 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4270892 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/14, H04L43/02 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04L41/14 (EP);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W24/04 (US);
H04L43/02 (EP);
H04W24/08 (CN);
H04W28/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] |
Former [2023/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUWEISUNG VON RESSOURCENEINHEITEN ZUR VERFOLGUNG | [2023/44] | English: | ALLOCATING RESOURCE ENTITIES FOR TRACE | [2023/44] | French: | ATTRIBUTION D'ENTITÉS DE RESSOURCES POUR TRACE | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012089876 (RACZ ANDRAS [HU], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0037] *; | [A]CN103747468 (DATANG MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES CO) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0068] - [0069] *; | [A]US9119080 (JACTAT CAROLINE [GB], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [I]US10567245 (PATIL SANTOSH RAMRAO [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * column 11, paragraph 2) * * column 23, line 52 - column 24, line 9 * * column 31, line 65 - column 32, line 14 * |