EP4265429 - PACKAGING ASSEMBLY, PARTICULARLY FOR USE AS AN ADVENT CALENDAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states prowito GmbH Borsigstraße 9 93092 Barbing / DE | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Ralf 93092 Sarching / DE | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Hannke Bittner & Partner mbB Regensburg Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23168947.2 | 20.04.2023 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | DE202220102177U | 22.04.2022 Original published format: DE 202022102177 U | [2023/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265429 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B42D5/04, B65D5/50, B65D85/60 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B65D85/60 (EP);
B42D15/00 (EP);
B42D5/04 (EP);
B65D5/5002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSANORDNUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ADVENTSKALENDER | [2023/43] | English: | PACKAGING ASSEMBLY, PARTICULARLY FOR USE AS AN ADVENT CALENDAR | [2023/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'EMBALLAGE, EN PARTICULIER DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ COMME CALENDRIER DE L'AVENT | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4406559 (4 P NICOLAUS KEMPTEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202015004303U (HANDELSHAUS HUBER KÖLLE LEBENSMITTEL GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202017000745U (HANDELSHAUS HUBER-KÖLLE LEBENSMITTEL GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202019104222U (PROWITO GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE202019104222U |