EP4272542 - COMBINATION AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERMANN, PHILIPPE 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
DOMMANGE, PIERRE 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
JUNG, BENEDIKT 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Stein, Stefan John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23169345.8 | 24.04.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | DE202220111005U | 04.05.2022 Original published format: DE 202022111005 U | DE202220111006U | 04.05.2022 Original published format: DE 202022111006 U | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272542 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/08 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
A01F15/08 (EP);
A01F15/0833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KOMBINATION | [2023/45] | English: | COMBINATION AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBINATION | [2023/45] | French: | COMBINAISON ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE COMBINAISON | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1683407 (DEERE & CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0035] *; | [XI]EP1813146 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1,15 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0067] * [I] 2-14; | [Y]EP2526759 (KRONE BERNARD MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * | by applicant | EP1813146 | EP2526759 |