EP4387032 - CONTROLLING FEEDER UNITS FOR SELF-RESTORATION OF POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHAN, Hammad Ahmad Mountain View, CA / US | 02 /
HAO, Kei Mountain View, CA / US | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 23169840.8 | 25.04.2023 | [2024/25] | Priority number, date | US202218081058 | 14.12.2022 Original published format: US202218081058 | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4387032 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H02J3/007 (EP);
H02J13/00036 (CN);
H02J3/001 (CN,US);
G01R19/16547 (US);
H02H3/063 (CN);
H02J13/0004 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG VON ZUFÜHREINHEITEN ZUR SELBSTWIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON ENERGIE | [2024/25] | English: | CONTROLLING FEEDER UNITS FOR SELF-RESTORATION OF POWER | [2024/25] | French: | COMMANDE D'UNITÉS D'ALIMENTATION POUR AUTO-RESTAURATION DE PUISSANCE | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009295231 (GAFFNEY SHAWN J [US], et al); | [A]US2018241245 (RET ALAIN [FR], et al); | [A]EP3509180 (ALSTOM TRANSP TECH [FR]); | [X]US11112815 (WADE AUSTIN EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]US11394201 (DELAGO JULIE M [US], et al) |