EP4268740 - PLUNGING/LINKAGE SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker European Operations Limited Anngrove IDA Business & Technology Park Carrigtwohill, Co. Cork T45 HX08 / IE | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANDER, Nils 24340 Eckernförde / DE | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 23170114.5 | 26.04.2023 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | US202263334883P | 26.04.2022 Original published format: US 202263334883 P | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268740 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72, A61B17/74, A61B17/80, A61B17/86 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61B17/725 (EP,US);
A61B17/744 (EP);
A61B17/8605 (EP);
A61B17/8625 (EP);
A61B17/863 (EP);
A61B17/8635 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAUCH-/GESTÄNGESCHRAUBE | [2023/44] | English: | PLUNGING/LINKAGE SCREW | [2023/44] | French: | VIS PLONGEANTE OU DE LIAISON | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8157803 (ZIRKLE JR LEWIS G [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 34; figures 1,13,24,25 * * column 14, line 16 - column 15, line 18 * * column 19, line 52 - column 20, line 4 *; | [A]US2015320461 (EHMKE LARRY W [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0039] - [0042]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2019015138 (SCHWARDT JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0049] - [0052]; figures 14-17 *; | [A]US2021204989 (WILLIAMS SETH K [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0083] , [0089]; figures 8A-10D * | by applicant | US2021338294 |